NY A07253 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s5189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s5189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing additional enforcement mechanisms for collection of spousal or child support.
Title
Relates to providing additional enforcement mechanisms for collection of spousal or child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5189 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.134 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05189 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.365