NY A07146 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the filing deadline from two years to five years for active and retired firefighters in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Relates to extending the filing deadline from two years to five years for active and retired firefighters in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.236 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1730 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5012A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.278 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.278 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | print number 7146a |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05012 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7146A