NY A07140 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7611a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to fees collected for animal licenses; makes technical corrections relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to fees collected for animal licenses; makes technical corrections relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted by s7611a
2012-06-19Assemblyamended on third reading 7140b
2012-06-11Assemblyamended on third reading 7140a
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.237
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.129
2011-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.129
2011-06-13Assemblyreported
2011-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-04-13Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S05842 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S07611 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.446

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback