NY S05842 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees collected for animal licenses; makes technical corrections relating thereto.
Title
Relates to fees collected for animal licenses; makes technical corrections relating thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07140 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7611a