NY S07611 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.446
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to fees collected for animal licenses; makes technical corrections relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to fees collected for animal licenses; makes technical corrections relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.446
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading cal.237
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a7140b
2012-06-21Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2012-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1488
2012-06-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 7611A
2012-06-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE
2012-06-07SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A07140 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7611a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback