NY A07101 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - substituted by s5870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - substituted by s5870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the release of personnel or employees as a retaliatory action against employees who complain or assist in proceedings involving unlawful discriminatory practices by employers.
Title
Prohibits the release of personnel or employees as a retaliatory action against employees who complain or assist in proceedings involving unlawful discriminatory practices by employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Assembly | substituted by s5870 |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.432 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05870 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - SIGNED CHAP.140