NY S05870 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the release of personnel or employees as a retaliatory action against employees who complain or assist in proceedings involving unlawful discriminatory practices by employers.
Title
Prohibits the release of personnel or employees as a retaliatory action against employees who complain or assist in proceedings involving unlawful discriminatory practices by employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.140 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.432 |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | substituted for a7101 |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.389 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1065 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07101 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - substituted by s5870