NY A07093 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility requirements for the receipt of child care assistance; removes requirement for an individual to work at least 17 1/2 hours per week for families with incomes up to two hundred percent of the state income standard who are attending a post secondary educational program.
Title
Relates to eligibility requirements for the receipt of child care assistance; removes requirement for an individual to work at least 17 1/2 hours per week for families with incomes up to two hundred percent of the state income standard who are attending a post secondary educational program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.230 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.277 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06865 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES