NY A07092 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-09 - print number 7092b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-09 - print number 7092b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the New York city condominium and cooperative tax abatement for dwelling units whose billable assessed value is two hundred thousand dollars or greater and instructs that the money used to formerly fund such abatement be reallocated to the New York city housing authority; extends certain provisions of the partial tax abatement for residential real property held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Eliminates the New York city condominium and cooperative tax abatement for dwelling units whose billable assessed value is two hundred thousand dollars or greater and instructs that the money used to formerly fund such abatement be reallocated to the New York city housing authority; extends certain provisions of the partial tax abatement for residential real property held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Assembly | print number 7092b |
2020-09-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7092a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05267 (Same As) 2020-08-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A