NY A07048 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making service upon a financial institution of orders of attachment and notices and orders in aid of enforcement of judgments effective upon any account to which the financial institution is a garnishee.
Title
Relates to making service upon a financial institution of orders of attachment and notices and orders in aid of enforcement of judgments effective upon any account to which the financial institution is a garnishee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.550 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |