NY A07043 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the election of trustees of the Long Island Power Authority.
Title
Relates to the election of trustees of the Long Island Power Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.608 |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |