NY A07035 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Living Water for Women, Inc. to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in Glen Cove, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes Living Water for Women, Inc. to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in Glen Cove, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.446 |
2013-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1058 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4975A |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7035a |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.495 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04975 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7035A