NY S04975 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7035A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7035A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Living Water for Women, Inc to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in Glen Cove, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes Living Water for Women, Inc to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in Glen Cove, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7035A |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1058 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4975A |
2013-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07035 (Same As) 2013-10-23 - signed chap.446