NY A07026 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - print number 7026a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - print number 7026a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the autism mapping program; requires a report mapping the frequency of the occurrence of autism in various locations around the state.
Title
Provides for the autism mapping program; requires a report mapping the frequency of the occurrence of autism in various locations around the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7026a |
2018-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01698 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health