NY S01698 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the autism detection, education and mapping program.
Title
Provides for the autism detection, education and mapping program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1926 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1698B |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1698A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07026 (Same As) 2018-06-08 - print number 7026a