NY A06975 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies.
Title
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6975c |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.261 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.37 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.37 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | print number 6975b |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | print number 6975a |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00060 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
S05093 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
S05093 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS