NY A06971 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for leasing of cemetery lands upon notice to and approval of the cemetery board.
Title
Provides for leasing of cemetery lands upon notice to and approval of the cemetery board.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.200 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1074 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6257A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.272 |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06257 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6971