NY S06257 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6971
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6971
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for leasing of cemetery lands upon notice to and approval of the cemetery board.
Title
Provides for leasing of cemetery lands upon notice to and approval of the cemetery board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6971 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1074 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6257A |
2021-04-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06971 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - signed chap.200