NY A06949 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain geothermal boreholes at depths beyond five hundred feet from certain requirements for wells drilled deeper than five hundred feet below the earth's surface.
Title
Exempts certain geothermal boreholes at depths beyond five hundred feet from certain requirements for wells drilled deeper than five hundred feet below the earth's surface.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] | Asm. Tony Simone [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Assembly | approval memo.9 |
2023-09-21 | Assembly | signed chap.483 |
2023-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1149 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6604 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.177 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.177 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06604 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6949