NY A06941 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Franklin county civil service commission to provide for the employment of retired police officers as part-time municipal police officers.
Title
Directs the Franklin county civil service commission to provide for the employment of retired police officers as part-time municipal police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03735 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to governmental employees