NY A06941 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-29 - print number 6941a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-29 - print number 6941a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "child sexual abuse and exploitation prevention act"; relates to prostitution offenses and creating the crime of sexual exploitation of a child; relates to computer sex crimes against children.
Title
Enacts the "child sexual abuse and exploitation prevention act"; relates to prostitution offenses and creating the crime of sexual exploitation of a child; relates to computer sex crimes against children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | print number 6941a | |
2010-01-29 | amend and recommit to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to codes | |
2009-03-17 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S2205-A (Same As) 2010-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2205A