CT HB05198 | 2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 124
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To extend telehealth provisions adopted during the COVID-19 pandemic until June 30, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Telehealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-26HouseFile Number 124
2024-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 110
2024-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2024-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-03-19HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM
2024-03-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-03-11HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2024-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2024-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback