TN SB2018 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, declares a private entity to be not civilly liable in a class action resulting from a cybersecurity event unless the cybersecurity event was caused by willful and wanton misconduct or gross negligence on the part of the private entity. - Amends TCA Title 29 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29 and Title 47, relative to civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 991 | |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2434 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-29 - Effective date(s) 05/21/2024