NY A06931 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - print number 6931a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - print number 6931a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to granting retroactive tier IV membership in the NY state and local employees' retirement system for Rebecca Leonard.
Title
Relates to granting retroactive tier IV membership in the NY state and local employees' retirement system for Rebecca Leonard.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Assembly | print number 6931a |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04366 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4366A