NY A06921 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Clinton county's authorization to impose an additional 1% rate of sales and compensating use tax through November 30, 2015.
Title
Extends Clinton county's authorization to impose an additional 1% rate of sales and compensating use tax through November 30, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.214 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.865 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4462 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.242 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04462 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6921