NY A06884 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring automobile brokers to be licensed and bonded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring automobile brokers to be licensed and bonded.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1056
2017-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5380B
2017-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.595
2017-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.595
2017-06-20Assemblyreported
2017-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-06-15Assemblyprint number 6884b
2017-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2017-06-14Assemblyprint number 6884a
2017-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2017-03-23Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S05380 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6884B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06884
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06884A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06884B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06884&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6884#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback