NY A06823 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-9)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - signed chap.189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the crime of sex trafficking of a child; intentionally advances or profits from prostitution of another where such person is a child less than eighteen years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the crime of sex trafficking of a child; intentionally advances or profits from prostitution of another where such person is a child less than eighteen years old.

Sponsors

Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Sen. James Skoufis [D]
Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Addie Jenne [D]
Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Brian Curran [R]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Joseph Errigo [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Erik Bohen [R]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]

Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15Senatesigned chap.189
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1065
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5988B
2018-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.156
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.156
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyprint number 6823c
2018-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2018-01-05Assemblyprint number 6823b
2018-01-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-05-10Assemblyprint number 6823a
2017-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2017-03-21Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S05988 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6823C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06823
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06823A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06823B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06823C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6823#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback