NY S05988 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6823C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the crime of sex trafficking of a child; intentionally advances or profits from prostitution of another where such person is a child less than eighteen years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the crime of sex trafficking of a child; intentionally advances or profits from prostitution of another where such person is a child less than eighteen years old.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6823C
2018-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5988B
2018-06-06SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-05-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1065
2018-05-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-20SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 5988A
2018-01-09SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2054
2017-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-05-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06823 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - signed chap.189

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05988&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05988&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05988
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05988&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05988A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05988&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05988B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SC4
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5988#SF3

Bill Comments

feedback