NY A06814 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires fire-resistant material applicators to undergo training and certification; imposes fines for violations.
Title
Requires fire-resistant material applicators to undergo training and certification; imposes fines for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | print number 6814a |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06413 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN