NY A06807 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - print number 6807a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - print number 6807a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends murder in the first degree to include victims who are members of the military or reserves.
Title
Extends murder in the first degree to include victims who are members of the military or reserves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6807a |
2016-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-04-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04520 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - referred to codes