NY A06801 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6565
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6565
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Examines the need for standards for the designation of therapy dogs and relates to the definition and identification of therapy dogs.
Title
Examines the need for standards for the designation of therapy dogs and relates to the definition and identification of therapy dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6565 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.389 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.389 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 6801a |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to agriculture |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05354 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06565 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.61
S06565 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.61