NY S06565 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Examines the need for standards for the designation of therapy dogs and relates to the definition and identification of therapy dogs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Examines the need for standards for the designation of therapy dogs and relates to the definition and identification of therapy dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.389
2017-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a6801a
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1505
2017-06-02SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A06801 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6565

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback