NY A06776 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s6678b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the town of Putnam Valley, Putnam county, to lease sports field fences at Leonard Wagner Memorial Park for advertisements with the revenues to be used solely by such town's department of parks and recreation for such sports field.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits the town of Putnam Valley, Putnam county, to lease sports field fences at Leonard Wagner Memorial Park for advertisements with the revenues to be used solely by such town's department of parks and recreation for such sports field.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s6678b
2024-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.565
2024-06-07Assemblyreported
2024-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-06-07Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2024-06-03Assemblyprint number 6776b
2024-06-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to local governments
2024-01-12Assemblyreference changed to local governments
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2023-06-10SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-10Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.830
2023-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.830
2023-06-10Assemblyreported
2023-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-05Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-05-18Assemblyprint number 6776a
2023-05-18Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to local governments
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06678 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6776
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06776
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06776A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06776B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06776&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback