NY S06678 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the town of Putnam Valley, Putnam county, to lease sports field fences at Leonard Wagner Memorial Park for advertisements with the revenues to be used solely by such town's department of parks and recreation for such sports field.
Title
Permits the town of Putnam Valley, Putnam county, to lease sports field fences at Leonard Wagner Memorial Park for advertisements with the revenues to be used solely by such town's department of parks and recreation for such sports field.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.565 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6776b |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2024-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1693 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6678B |
2024-05-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6678A |
2023-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06776 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s6678b