NY A06694 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to establish a next of kin registry for holders of drivers' licenses, learners' permits and non-driver identification cards; such holders may submit their emergency contact information to be used by police in the event the holder is injured or killed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to establish a next of kin registry for holders of drivers' licenses, learners' permits and non-driver identification cards; such holders may submit their emergency contact information to be used by police in the event the holder is injured or killed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-30Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to transportation
2013-04-16Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S01948 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback