NY S01948 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to establish a next of kin registry for holders of drivers' licenses, learners' permits and non-driver identification cards; such holders may submit their emergency contact information to be used by police in the event the holder is injured or killed.
Title
Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to establish a next of kin registry for holders of drivers' licenses, learners' permits and non-driver identification cards; such holders may submit their emergency contact information to be used by police in the event the holder is injured or killed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.511 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1178 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06694 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - enacting clause stricken
A09120 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - referred to transportation
A09120 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - referred to transportation