NY A06662 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of New York city, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of New York city, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for New York city; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of New York city, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of New York city, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for New York city; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | signed chap.64 |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.487 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5111 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.301 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05111 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6662