NY A06636 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - print number 6636b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - print number 6636b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for cost-of-living adjustments; provides that the base benefit amount shall be increased annually by reference to the consumer price index for each applicable calendar year beginning on September 1, 2024.
Title
Provides for cost-of-living adjustments; provides that the base benefit amount shall be increased annually by reference to the consumer price index for each applicable calendar year beginning on September 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D] | Asm. Joseph Angelino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Assembly | print number 6636b |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | print number 6636a |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06152 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 6152A