NY A06613 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system, in the town of Yorktown, county of Westchester, as the "Specialist David R. Fahey Jr. Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system, in the town of Yorktown, county of Westchester, as the "Specialist David R. Fahey Jr. Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Katz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | signed chap.63 |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4495 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.499 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.499 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04495 (Same As) 2015-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6613