NY A06604 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to eliminate the restrictions upon transferring for members of the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Title
Makes technical corrections to eliminate the restrictions upon transferring for members of the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.292 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.770 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5135A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.446 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05135 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6604