NY A06593 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5257c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5257c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Housing Our Neighbors with Dignity act" in order to provide a mechanism for the state to finance the acquisition of distressed hotels and commercial office properties by the appropriate nonprofit organizations for the purpose of maintaining or increasing affordable housing.
Title
Enacts the "Housing Our Neighbors with Dignity act" in order to provide a mechanism for the state to finance the acquisition of distressed hotels and commercial office properties by the appropriate nonprofit organizations for the purpose of maintaining or increasing affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s5257c |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.721 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6593b |
2021-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | print number 6593a |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05257 (Same As) 2021-08-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.17