NY A06579 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s5676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s5676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to do a comprehensive assessment of the existing methodology used to determine payment for early intervention screenings, evaluations, services and service coordination; directs recommendations on reimbursement methodology as well as needs under the program.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to do a comprehensive assessment of the existing methodology used to determine payment for early intervention screenings, evaluations, services and service coordination; directs recommendations on reimbursement methodology as well as needs under the program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s5676 |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.599 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05676 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.74