NY A06575 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an internet mapping resource of school age home visiting programs.
Title
Relates to an internet mapping resource of school age home visiting programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.543 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1405 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6031 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.426 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06031 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.543