NY A06571 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the energy storage deployment program to encourage the installation of qualified energy storage systems; relates to commercially available technology that is capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and thereafter dispatching the energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the energy storage deployment program to encourage the installation of qualified energy storage systems; relates to commercially available technology that is capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and thereafter dispatching the energy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senateapproval memo.20
2017-11-29Senatesigned chap.415
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1887
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5190
2017-05-17SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2017-05-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.352
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-03-22Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-03-09Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S05190 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6571

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06571&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06571&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06571
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06571&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06571&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06571&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6571#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback