NY A06554 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the village of Rye Brook occupancy tax for three years.
Title
Extends the village of Rye Brook occupancy tax for three years.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.211 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.533 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6554 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.505 |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5083 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.533 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05083 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.211