NY A06545 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders of protection expiration dates and the duration of temporary orders of protection in juvenile delinquency cases; requires expiration dates for orders of protection under certain articles of the family court act to be plainly stated; provides that a temporary order of protection in juvenile delinquency cases may remain in effect for an initial period of up to thirty days and may be extended by the court for good cause, upon notice to the juvenile; provides that the juvenile has a right to counsel upon the extension of the order of protection.
Title
Relates to orders of protection expiration dates and the duration of temporary orders of protection in juvenile delinquency cases; requires expiration dates for orders of protection under certain articles of the family court act to be plainly stated; provides that a temporary order of protection in juvenile delinquency cases may remain in effect for an initial period of up to thirty days and may be extended by the court for good cause, upon notice to the juvenile; provides that the juvenile has a right to counsel upon the extension of the order of protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Assembly | signed chap.402 |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1727 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7535 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.185 |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07535 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6545