NY A06538 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licenses for private investigators, bail enforcement agents and watch, guard or patrol agencies; separates licensing of private investigators from that of bail enforcement agents and patrol agencies; increases punishment for private investigation without a license.
Title
Relates to licenses for private investigators, bail enforcement agents and watch, guard or patrol agencies; separates licensing of private investigators from that of bail enforcement agents and patrol agencies; increases punishment for private investigation without a license.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | print number 6538a |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04000 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - referred to economic development