NY A06534 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - signed chap.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - signed chap.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the residency requirements for New York city marshals to allow residency in the counties of Nassau, Westchester, Suffolk, Orange, Rockland or Putnam.
Title
Expands the residency requirements for New York city marshals to allow residency in the counties of Nassau, Westchester, Suffolk, Orange, Rockland or Putnam.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Senate | signed chap.23 |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-05-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.126 |
2011-05-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3392 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.180 |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03392 (Same As) 2011-05-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6534