NY A06523 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hindu Welfare Association of New York, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Hindu Welfare Association of New York, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.185 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.121 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1296C |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6523d |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | print number 6523c |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | print number 6523b |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | print number 6523a |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01296 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6523D