NY A06477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a plaintiff in a mortgage foreclosure action to maintain the subject property in good faith.
Title
Requires a plaintiff in a mortgage foreclosure action to maintain the subject property in good faith.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.232 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.232 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04819 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to judiciary